Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1922 |
09/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47245 |
18/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1922 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 684 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
18/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47245 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|