Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1919 |
22/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47242 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47659 |
14/10/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47814 |
16/06/1989 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57306 |
31/03/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/11/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
07/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/11/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
09/1972 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
07/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
lX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1919 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 681 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47242 |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
14/10/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47659 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
16/06/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47814 |
|
|
31/03/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57306 |
|
|