Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1791 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15834 Week
» 80788 Month
» 283452 Year
» 3310305 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1918 |
16/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47241 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/11/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1972 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1918 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 680 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47241 |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47241 |
|
|
01/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|