Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32068 Week
» 130713 Month
» 333377 Year
» 3360230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1912 |
m/e |
04/1882 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Armstrong |
Class |
1901 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Number |
J2 |
Works Number |
421 |
To Service |
During 04/1882 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/12/1949 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
OXF |
Oxford |
4w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
SHL |
Southall |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
SLO |
Slough |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1898 |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
03/1930 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1882 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1912 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 421 |
|
|
02/1898 |
Modification |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (SHL) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (SHL) |
|
|
30/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1912 |
|
|