Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1479 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14885 Week
» 67901 Month
» 187428 Year
» 3214281 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1894 |
03/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47375 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/12/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1894 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 656 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47375 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|