Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1620 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7404 Week
» 28793 Month
» 148320 Year
» 3175173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1886 |
26/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47367 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
648 |
To Service |
26/08/1965 to Immingham (40B) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/2002 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
12/2002 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/08/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1886 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 648 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
18/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47367 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/2002 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
31/12/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47367 |
|
|