Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 57 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17860 Week
» 70876 Month
» 190403 Year
» 3217256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1880 |
10/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47361 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/02/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/02/1966 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1880 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 642 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47361 |
|
|
22/07/1983 |
Naming |
Named 'Wilton Endeavour' by Thomas Hutchison, Chairman of I.C.I. at I.C.I., Wilton-on-Teeside |
|
|
31/08/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47361 |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|