Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3427 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16833 Week
» 69849 Month
» 189376 Year
» 3216229 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1879 |
07/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47360 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/07/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1879 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 641 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47360 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47360 |
|
|
12/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|