Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 797 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18600 Week
» 71616 Month
» 191143 Year
» 3217996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1873 |
28/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47223 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/05/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1873 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 635 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47223 |
|
|
31/01/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47223 |
|
|
26/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|