Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14894 Week
» 67910 Month
» 187437 Year
» 3214290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1870 |
11/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47220 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/06/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1870 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 632 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47220 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47220 |
|
|
04/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: Attercliffe |
|
|