Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 107 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17910 Week
» 70926 Month
» 190453 Year
» 3217306 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1864 |
11/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47214 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
13/06/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
13/06/1981 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1864 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 626 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47214 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
13/06/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/11/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47214 |
|
|
22/07/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|