Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14004 Week
» 67020 Month
» 186547 Year
» 3213400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1863 |
11/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47213 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/06/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1863 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 625 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47213 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47213 |
|
|
30/09/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|