Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4394 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 15609 Week
» 6665 Month
» 353089 Year
» 3379942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1860 |
28/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47210 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/08/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 09/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1860 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 622 Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
24/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47210 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
08/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|