Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4314 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23225 Week
» 88179 Month
» 290843 Year
» 3317696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1859 |
21/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47209 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/6) |
57604 |
28/02/2004 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/08/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
25/08/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1859 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
21/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47209 |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (Unknown WR depot
) |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
21/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
28/02/2004 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57604 |
|
|