Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1318 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14724 Week
» 67740 Month
» 187267 Year
» 3214120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1854 |
02/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47204 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57012 |
20/03/2000 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/07/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/1980 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1854 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 616 Allocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47204 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/03/2000 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Envoy' |
|
|
20/03/2000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57012 |
|
|