Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2137 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19940 Week
» 72956 Month
» 192483 Year
» 3219336 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1843 |
21/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47193 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
605 |
To Service |
21/05/1965 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
04/12/2004 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1979 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1843 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 605 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47193 |
|
|
11/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47193 |
|
|
04/12/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|