Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 514 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6298 Week
» 27687 Month
» 147214 Year
» 3174067 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1842 |
14/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47192 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
604 |
To Service |
14/05/1965 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
18/05/1988 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/05/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xih |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/02/1970 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Light engine |
|
30/10/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
15/09/2011 |
Information |
Currently located at the Railway Age, Crewe. It arrived at the Heritage Centre in 2008 after working at the Churnet Valley Railway in Staffordshire. |
Link |
www.preserved-diesels.co.uk/engines/47192_index.htm |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1842 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 604 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47192 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
18/05/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47192 |
|
|