Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2407 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15813 Week
» 68829 Month
» 188356 Year
» 3215209 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1841 |
27/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47191 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/04/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/04/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1841 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 603 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47191 |
|
|
25/06/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47191 |
|
|
20/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: at Thornaby MPD |
|
|