Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1644 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19447 Week
» 72463 Month
» 191990 Year
» 3218843 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1837 |
04/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47187 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57006 |
04/05/1999 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
22/05/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
22/05/1981 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/12/1970 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1837 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 599 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47187 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
22/05/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/05/1999 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Reliance' |
|
|
04/05/1999 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57006 |
|
|