Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1834 |
31/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47353 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/03/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/01/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1834 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 596 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47353 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47353 |
|
|
18/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|