Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 943 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18746 Week
» 71762 Month
» 191289 Year
» 3218142 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1818 |
18/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47337 |
21/09/1973 |
|
TOPS (57/6) |
57602 |
30/11/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1983 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1983 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1818 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 580 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
21/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47337 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
30/11/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57602 |
|
|