Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1041 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14447 Week
» 67463 Month
» 186990 Year
» 3213843 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1812 |
02/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47331 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1812 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 574 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47331 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
31/07/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47331 |
|
|
08/09/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|