Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 775 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14181 Week
» 67197 Month
» 186724 Year
» 3213577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1806 |
26/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47325 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/01/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/01/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1806 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 568 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47325 |
|
|
07/03/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47325 |
|
|
21/05/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|