Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3959 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13533 Week
» 78487 Month
» 281151 Year
» 3308004 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1795 |
08/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47314 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/01/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/01/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1795 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 557 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47314 |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47314 |
|
|
30/04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|