Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 553 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18356 Week
» 71372 Month
» 190899 Year
» 3217752 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1787 |
26/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47306 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
549 |
To Service |
26/11/1964 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
31/05/2006 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/11/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1964 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/05/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1787 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 549 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47306 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
07/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47306 |
|
|