Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1781 |
07/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47186 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/11/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1984 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/11/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/11/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1781 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 543 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47186 |
|
|
06/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47186 |
|
|
12/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|