Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16258 Week
» 69274 Month
» 188801 Year
» 3215654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1780 |
30/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47185 |
03/11/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47602 |
11/11/1983 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47824 |
20/04/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/11/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/11/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/11/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/03/1970 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1780 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 542 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47185 |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
20/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/11/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47602 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/04/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47824 |
|
|
01/09/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47824 |
|
|
04/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|