Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1779 |
29/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47184 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47585 |
18/01/1981 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/10/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1779 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 541 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47184 |
|
|
18/01/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47585 |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47585 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|