Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1314 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14720 Week
» 67736 Month
» 187263 Year
» 3214116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1778 |
23/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47183 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47579 |
22/03/1981 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
540 |
To Service |
23/10/1964 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/04/1970 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Light engine |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1778 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 540 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47183 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
22/03/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47579 |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47579 |
|
|