Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1729 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15135 Week
» 68151 Month
» 187678 Year
» 3214531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1776 |
22/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47181 |
27/09/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47578 |
31/12/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/10/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1776 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 538 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47181 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47578 |
|
|