Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 578 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18381 Week
» 71397 Month
» 190924 Year
» 3217777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1775 |
23/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47180 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47584 |
15/12/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/10/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1775 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 537 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47180 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
15/12/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47584 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47584 |
|
|
10/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|