Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 553 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19464 Week
» 84418 Month
» 287082 Year
» 3313935 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1767 |
29/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47172 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47583 |
09/11/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1980 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1767 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 529 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47172 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/11/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47583 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47583 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|