Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2499 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15905 Week
» 68921 Month
» 188448 Year
» 3215301 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1763 |
12/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47168 |
07/09/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47572 |
04/01/1981 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/09/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1763 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 525 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
07/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47168 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/01/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47572 |
|
|
01/06/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47572 |
|
|
08/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|