Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 858 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14264 Week
» 67280 Month
» 186807 Year
» 3213660 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1762 |
01/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47167 |
22/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47580 |
25/05/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/09/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1762 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 524 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
22/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47167 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
25/05/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47580 |
|
|
01/04/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47580 |
|
|