Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1760 |
08/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47492 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
522 |
To Service |
08/09/1964 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/1999 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/09/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1973 |
|
Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1760 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 522 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control removed |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47492 |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47492 |
|
|