Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1756 |
04/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47162 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/09/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/01/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1969 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
12/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1756 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 518 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47162 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
14/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47162 |
|
|
05/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|