Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2147 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16190 Week
» 81144 Month
» 283808 Year
» 3310661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1755 |
14/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47161 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47541 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
517 |
To Service |
14/08/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys |
Information |
Carried worksplate '483' but on paper it was '517' |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/08/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1974 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1755 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 517 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47161 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47541 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47541 |
|
|