Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 555 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6339 Week
» 27728 Month
» 147255 Year
» 3174108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1754 |
19/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47160 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47605 |
09/02/1984 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
516 |
To Service |
19/08/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2003 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Information |
Carried worksplate '482' but on paper it was '516' |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/08/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
02/1984 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1984 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
voh |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/01/1970 |
Severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1754 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 516 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
09/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47160 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
21/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
02/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
09/02/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47605 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
22/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/12/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47605 |
|
|