Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1748 |
01/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47155 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47660 |
18/12/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47815 |
31/08/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/07/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1748 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 510 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47155 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
18/12/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47660 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
31/08/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47815 |
|
|