Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1705 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15111 Week
» 68127 Month
» 187654 Year
» 3214507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1746 |
03/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47153 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47551 |
02/1975 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47801 |
15/09/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/01/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/01/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1746 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 508 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47153 |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47551 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
15/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47801 |
|
|
01/06/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47801 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|