Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1740 |
12/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47147 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/06/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
01/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1740 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 502 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47147 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/04/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47147 |
|
|
03/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester (Marlowe Road) |
|
|