04/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1739 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 501 Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47146 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47146 |
|
|
23/06/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|