Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1294 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14700 Week
» 67716 Month
» 187243 Year
» 3214096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1736 |
22/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47143 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/04/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/06/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1736 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 498 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47143 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
25/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/12/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47143 |
|
|
06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by D Higgs: at Doncaster MPD |
|
|