Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 422 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26456 Week
» 125101 Month
» 327765 Year
» 3354618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1735 |
23/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47142 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/05/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
22/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/06/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1735 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 497 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
22/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47142 |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
28/04/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47142 |
|
|
09/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester (Marlowe Road) |
|
|