Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 876 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18679 Week
» 71695 Month
» 191222 Year
» 3218075 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1731 |
16/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47139 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47550 |
02/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/06/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
05/10/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1731 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 493 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47139 but not taken up |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47550 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|