Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18382 Week
» 71398 Month
» 190925 Year
» 3217778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1730 |
28/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47138 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47607 |
09/03/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47821 |
29/03/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/04/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
12/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
19/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1730 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 492 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47138 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/03/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47607 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
29/03/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47821 |
|
|