Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1808 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19611 Week
» 72627 Month
» 192154 Year
» 3219007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1726 |
24/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47134 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47622 |
16/10/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47841 |
20/12/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/03/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
09/09/1976 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/09/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1726 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 488 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47134 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
16/10/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47622 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
20/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47841 |
|
|