Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1375 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25006 Week
» 89960 Month
» 292624 Year
» 3319477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1723 |
17/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47132 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47540 |
10/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
485 |
To Service |
17/03/1964 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1998 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Information |
Carried worksplate '494' but on paper it was '485' |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/03/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
10/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1723 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 485 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47132 but not taken up |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47540 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/05/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47540 |
|
|