Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1722 |
13/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47131 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
02/1984 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1984 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
01/1979 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1984 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1722 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 484 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47131 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
02/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
23/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47131 |
|
|
30/06/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|