Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 150 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15762 Week
» 114407 Month
» 317071 Year
» 3343924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1721 |
06/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47130 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
483 |
To Service |
06/03/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
04/03/1988 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
on 24/10/1990 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Information |
Carried worksplate '492' but on paper it was '483' |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/03/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/01/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1721 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 483 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47130 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47130 |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|